Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 02/04/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/04/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 02/04/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 02/12/1998
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 02/12/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 02/24/1998
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/25/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/25/1998
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/19/1998