Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/23/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/27/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 03/05/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 03/06/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/16/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/17/1998