Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 06/10/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 06/10/1998
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/15/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/15/1998
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/15/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/15/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/15/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/16/1998
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/16/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/16/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/16/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 06/16/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/16/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/18/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/18/1998
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/19/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/23/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/23/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/23/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/24/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 06/24/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/24/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/24/1998
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 06/25/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/06/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/06/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/06/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/07/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/07/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 07/13/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 07/13/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/16/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/20/1998
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/01/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/01/1998