Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 09/01/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 09/01/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 09/01/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 09/01/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 09/01/1998
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/01/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 09/01/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 09/01/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 09/01/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 09/01/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 09/01/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/02/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 09/02/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 09/08/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/08/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/11/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/22/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/15/1998