Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 01/28/1997
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 01/28/1997
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/04/1997
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 02/13/1997
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/13/1997
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/03/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/17/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/21/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/07/1997
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 04/07/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/07/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/07/1997
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/07/1997
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/07/1997
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/15/1997
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 04/17/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/17/1997
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 04/17/1997
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/17/1997
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/22/1997
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 04/23/1997
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/23/1997
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/14/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 05/14/1997
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/14/1997
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/23/1997
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 06/02/1997
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 06/05/1997
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/25/1997
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/25/1997
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 06/25/1997
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/27/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 09/15/1997