Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/29/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 01/29/1998
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/29/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/29/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 01/29/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 01/29/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 02/03/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/04/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/05/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/09/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/10/1998
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/23/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 02/23/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/03/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/30/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/30/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 03/31/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/27/1998