Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 02/24/1998
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 02/24/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/24/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 02/24/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/24/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/24/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/24/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/24/1998
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/24/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/24/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 02/24/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/24/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 03/03/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/03/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/03/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/03/1998
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/03/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/03/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/03/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/03/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/03/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/03/1998
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/26/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/26/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/26/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/26/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/26/1998
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/26/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/26/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/21/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/21/1998
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/22/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/22/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/22/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/22/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 04/22/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/22/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/22/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/22/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/22/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 04/22/1998
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/22/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/22/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/22/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/22/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/22/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 04/22/1998
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/22/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/22/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/22/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 04/22/1998
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/22/1998
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 04/22/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/22/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/22/1998
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/22/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/22/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/22/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 04/22/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/22/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/22/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/22/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/22/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/22/1998
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/22/1998
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 04/22/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/22/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/22/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/22/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/29/1998
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/30/1998