Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 02/12/1998
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/25/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/25/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/25/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/25/1998
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 03/02/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/02/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/02/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/02/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/02/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/04/1998
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/04/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/04/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 03/04/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/11/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/11/1998
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/11/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/16/1998
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/16/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/19/1998
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/19/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/19/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/19/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/25/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 03/25/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/25/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/02/1998
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/02/1998
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/02/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/02/1998
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/12/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/12/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/12/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 05/12/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/12/1998
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/13/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/13/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/13/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/22/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/22/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/22/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/22/1998
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/01/1998
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/01/1998