Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 05/05/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 06/02/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/02/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/02/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/02/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/02/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 06/02/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/02/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/02/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 06/02/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 06/02/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/02/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/02/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/02/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/02/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/02/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/02/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 06/02/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/02/1998
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/02/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 06/02/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/02/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/02/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/02/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/02/1998
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/02/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/02/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 06/02/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/02/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/02/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/02/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/02/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/02/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/02/1998
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/02/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/02/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 06/02/1998
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/22/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/22/1998
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/13/1998
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/13/1998
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/13/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/13/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/13/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/13/1998