Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/01/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 09/01/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/01/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 09/01/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/01/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/02/1998
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/02/1998
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/02/1998
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/10/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/14/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/14/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/14/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/17/1998
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/18/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/22/1998