Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 07/30/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 07/30/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/16/1998
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/16/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/16/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/21/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/21/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/21/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/21/1998
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/21/1998
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 09/21/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/24/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/24/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/24/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/29/1998
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 09/29/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/29/1998
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/29/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 10/02/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 10/02/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 10/02/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/02/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 10/02/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/02/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 10/02/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 10/02/1998
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 10/02/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/05/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/05/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/05/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 10/05/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/05/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/05/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/05/1998