Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/09/1997
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 09/09/1997
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/09/1997
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 09/09/1997
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/09/1997
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/09/1997
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 09/09/1997
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 09/09/1997
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/09/1997
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 09/09/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 09/09/1997
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 09/09/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/09/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 09/09/1997
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 09/09/1997
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/09/1997
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/09/1997
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/09/1997
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/09/1997
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/09/1997
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 09/09/1997
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/24/1997
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/24/1997
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/24/1997
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/24/1997
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/24/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 09/24/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/24/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/06/1997
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 10/06/1997
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/06/1997
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 10/06/1997
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/06/1997
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/06/1997
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 10/08/1997
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 10/08/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 10/08/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/08/1997
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/08/1997
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 10/08/1997
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/08/1997
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/08/1997
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/08/1997
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/08/1997
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/08/1997
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/08/1997
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/08/1997
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/08/1997
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 10/08/1997
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 10/08/1997
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 10/22/1997
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/22/1997
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 10/22/1997
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/22/1997
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 11/05/1997
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/03/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/03/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/03/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/03/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/03/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/03/1998