There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate regarding the conditions for the United States becoming a signatory to any international agreement on greenhouse gas emissions under the United Nations Framework Convention on Climate Change.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/25/1997Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 95-0. Record Vote No: 205.
07/21/1997Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms without amendment and with a preamble. With written report No. 105-54.
06/12/1997Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
07/25/1997Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 95-0. Record Vote No: 205.
07/25/1997Measure laid before Senate. (consideration: CR S8113-8139)
07/21/1997Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 120.
07/21/1997Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms without amendment and with a preamble. With written report No. 105-54.
07/17/1997Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/19/1997Subcommittee on International Economic Policy. Hearings held.
06/18/1997Star Print ordered on the measure.
06/18/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5945)
06/12/1997Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
06/12/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5623-5624)

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 06/12/1997
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 06/12/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 06/12/1997
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/18/1997
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/18/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/18/1997
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/18/1997
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 06/18/1997
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 06/18/1997
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/18/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 06/18/1997
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/18/1997
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/18/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/18/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/18/1997
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/18/1997
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/18/1997
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/22/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/23/1997
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/23/1997
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 07/23/1997
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 07/23/1997

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Foreign Relations06/12/1997 Referred to
07/17/1997 Markup by
07/21/1997 Reported by S. Rept. 105-54
Senate Foreign Relations Subcommittee on International Economic Policy, Export and Trade Promotion06/19/1997 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.Res.98. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/12/1997)

Declares that the United States should not be a signatory to any protocol to, or other agreement regarding, the United Nations Framework Convention on Climate Change of 1992, at negotiations in Kyoto in December 1997 or thereafter which would: (1) mandate new commitments to limit or reduce greenhouse gas emissions for the Annex 1 Parties, unless the protocol or other agreement also mandates new specific scheduled commitments to limit or reduce greenhouse gas emissions for Developing Country Parties within the same compliance period; or (2) result in serious harm to the U.S. economy.

Calls for any such protocol or other agreement which would require the advice and consent of the Senate to ratification to be accompanied by: (1) a detailed explanation of any legislation or regulatory actions that may be required to implement it; and (2) an analysis of the detailed financial costs which would be incurred by, and other impacts on, the U.S. economy.