Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/09/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/11/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/11/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/11/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/11/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/11/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/11/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/11/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/11/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/11/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/11/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/11/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/11/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/11/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 03/11/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 03/17/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/17/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/17/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/17/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/17/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 03/17/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/17/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/17/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/17/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/17/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/25/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/25/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/14/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/21/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/21/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/21/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/18/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/18/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/18/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/18/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/18/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/25/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/25/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/25/1999