Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/04/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/04/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/04/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/04/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/17/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/17/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/17/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/25/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/25/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/15/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/15/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/15/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/15/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/15/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/28/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/06/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/06/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/06/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/06/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/12/1999
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/12/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/12/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/20/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/20/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/20/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/20/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/08/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/08/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/08/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/08/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/08/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/08/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/25/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/25/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/25/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/25/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/01/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/16/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/16/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/16/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/16/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/16/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/16/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/30/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/30/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/30/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/30/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/01/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/08/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/14/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/28/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/19/2000