Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 03/04/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/04/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/15/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/15/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/15/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/12/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/12/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/12/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/12/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/12/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/12/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/12/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/12/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/16/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/16/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/17/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/17/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/17/2000