Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/09/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/09/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 03/09/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/09/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/09/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/09/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/09/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/16/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/16/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/22/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/22/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/12/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/15/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/22/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/05/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/17/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/22/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/29/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/30/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/30/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/30/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/16/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/16/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/15/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/01/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/01/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/01/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/01/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 03/09/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/21/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/22/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/22/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/22/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/22/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/22/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/22/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/22/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/22/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/22/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/22/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/22/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/28/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/28/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/30/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/30/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/30/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/30/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/30/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 03/30/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/30/2000
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/03/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/03/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/21/2000