Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/10/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/18/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/13/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/20/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/20/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/02/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/02/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/02/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/16/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/16/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/16/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/16/2000