Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/10/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/23/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/23/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/23/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/23/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/23/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/23/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/23/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/23/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/14/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/14/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/14/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/14/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/14/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/14/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/14/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/14/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/14/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/14/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/14/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/14/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/14/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/14/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/14/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/14/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 04/14/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/14/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/28/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/28/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/28/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/28/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/28/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/28/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/28/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/28/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/06/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/06/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/06/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/25/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/26/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/26/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/26/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/29/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 08/03/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/03/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/08/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/08/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/08/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/08/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/08/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/14/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/29/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/15/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/15/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/16/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/16/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/21/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/21/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/21/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/22/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 03/28/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/28/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/28/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/28/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/29/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/29/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/29/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/29/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/03/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/03/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/03/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/03/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/06/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/04/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/08/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/12/2000