Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/16/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/16/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/22/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/23/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/23/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/24/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/24/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/14/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/15/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/21/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/21/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/21/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/21/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/21/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/21/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/21/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 04/21/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/21/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/28/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/28/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/28/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/28/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/28/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/28/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/28/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/05/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/05/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/05/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/05/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/06/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/06/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/06/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/06/1999
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 05/10/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/11/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/11/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/11/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/12/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/12/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/17/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/18/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/24/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/26/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/07/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/08/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/08/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/09/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/09/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/10/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/14/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/15/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/15/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/15/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/17/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/22/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/22/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/22/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/22/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/22/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/22/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/22/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/25/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/25/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/25/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/25/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/25/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/29/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/19/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/13/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/13/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/30/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/04/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/07/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/07/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/13/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/13/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/13/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/13/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/13/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/14/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/14/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/19/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/19/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/19/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/21/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/21/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 10/21/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/28/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/09/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/09/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/09/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 11/18/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/02/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/14/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/15/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/15/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/01/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/01/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/01/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/01/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/01/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/01/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/01/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/06/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/06/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/06/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/08/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/08/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/08/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/08/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/08/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/08/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/08/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/08/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/15/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/16/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/16/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/16/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/16/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/29/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/05/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/06/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/10/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/13/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/07/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/18/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/20/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/20/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/21/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/21/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/21/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/25/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/25/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/25/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/25/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/25/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/03/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/03/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/03/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/12/2000