There is one summary for H.R.1071. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/11/1999)

Montgomery GI Bill Improvements Act of 1999 - Amends Federal basic educational assistance provisions (the Montgomery GI Bill) to authorize enhanced educational assistance to a member of the armed forces who, after September 30, 1999: (1) first enters on active duty; (2) reenlists or continues to serve on active duty; (3) serves a continuous period of active duty of four years; or (4) serves and is discharged or released for a service-connected disability, at the convenience of the Government (after serving at least 42 months of such duty), or due to a reduction in force. Limits to 36 months the period for such enhanced assistance, with a special rule for certain early separations. Requires the payment of educational expenses under such program, including tuition and fees, books, and other supplies. Provides: (1) a monthly stipend for approved programs of education, with different rates for programs pursued on a full-time, three quarter-time, or half-time basis; and (2) tutorial assistance.

(Sec. 3) Increases the monthly rates of basic educational assistance.

(Sec. 4) Repeals, with respect to such assistance: (1) a required monthly reduction in pay for individuals who do not elect to participate in such assistance program; (2) a provision authorizing individuals to elect not to receive such assistance; (3) the requirement that participants complete the requirements of a high school diploma or equivalency certificate prior to the end of their initial obligated period of service in order to be eligible to receive such assistance; and (4) provisions limiting an individual's opportunity to withdraw an election not to enroll in such assistance program.

(Sec. 5) Authorizes an individual entitled to basic educational assistance to receive an accelerated payment of such allowance, beginning on March 1, 2000, under certain conditions.

(Sec. 6) Authorizes the use of basic educational assistance for: (1) the payment of vocational or professional licensing or certification tests required under Federal, State, or local law; (2) preparatory courses for college and graduate school entrance exams; and (3) training for technological occupations offered by entities other than educational institutions.

(Sec. 9) Authorizes enrollment in the basic educational assistance program for individuals who: (1) before October 10, 1996, were enrolled in the veterans' educational assistance program (VEAP); (2) had continuously served on active duty since October 9, 1996; and (3) if discharged or released from active duty after the date on which the individual elects to participate in the basic educational assistance program, were discharged or released with an honorable discharge. Discontinues, after the enactment of this Act, the required reduction in basic pay for VEAP participants.