Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/11/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/11/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/18/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/18/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/18/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/18/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/15/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/15/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/15/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/15/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/15/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/15/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/19/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/29/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/29/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/29/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/29/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/24/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/24/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/24/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/24/1999