Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/20/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 05/20/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/20/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/20/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/22/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/22/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/29/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/29/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/29/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/29/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/05/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 08/05/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/27/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/27/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/27/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/18/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/18/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/01/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/13/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/13/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/13/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/13/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/13/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/13/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/17/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/17/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/14/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/14/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/14/2000