Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/18/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/18/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/15/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/21/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/21/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/28/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/16/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/12/1999