Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/18/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/21/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/21/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/21/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/21/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/21/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/21/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/21/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/27/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/27/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/27/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/28/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/29/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/04/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/04/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/04/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/04/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/06/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/13/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/13/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/13/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/18/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/18/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/18/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/18/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/18/1999
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/19/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/19/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 05/19/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/19/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/19/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/19/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/24/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/24/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/24/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/24/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/08/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/08/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/08/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/08/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/08/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/08/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/08/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/08/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/09/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/09/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 06/09/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/09/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/09/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/09/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/10/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/10/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/10/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/10/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/10/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/14/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/14/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/14/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/14/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/15/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/15/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/15/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/15/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/17/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/17/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/17/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/17/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/17/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/22/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/22/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/29/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/29/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/29/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/29/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/29/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/29/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/29/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/29/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/29/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/29/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/01/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/01/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/13/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/13/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/15/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/15/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/20/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/20/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/20/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/21/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/22/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/26/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/26/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/26/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 07/27/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 08/03/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 08/03/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 08/03/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/03/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 08/03/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 08/03/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/08/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/08/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/08/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/13/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/14/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/14/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/14/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/15/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/28/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/12/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/21/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/21/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/21/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/01/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/10/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/10/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 02/10/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/15/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/29/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/08/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/09/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/21/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/21/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/21/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/22/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/29/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/04/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/02/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/15/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/15/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/24/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/24/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/25/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/09/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/29/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/11/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/11/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/12/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/12/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/17/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/17/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/17/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/17/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/17/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/17/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/17/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/17/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/18/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/18/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/18/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/18/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 07/19/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/19/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/19/2000