Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/11/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 03/11/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/16/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/16/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/18/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/12/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/12/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/14/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/18/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/30/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/22/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/09/1999