Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/25/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/25/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/11/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/19/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/19/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/13/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/17/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/12/2000