Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/17/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/17/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/17/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/18/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/18/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/18/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/18/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/18/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/18/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/12/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/12/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/14/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/14/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/14/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/15/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/15/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/15/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/21/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/21/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/21/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/21/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/21/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/22/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/26/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/26/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/26/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/29/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/29/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/04/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/04/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/04/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/04/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 05/04/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/04/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/05/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/17/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/18/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/19/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/20/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/24/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/24/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/26/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/07/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/07/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/07/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/10/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/10/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/10/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/10/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/14/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/15/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/15/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/15/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/16/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/16/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/17/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/17/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/18/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/29/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/12/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/12/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/12/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/12/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/13/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/15/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/15/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/15/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/16/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/26/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/26/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 08/02/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/02/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/02/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/02/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 08/03/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 08/03/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 08/03/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 08/03/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 08/03/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 08/04/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 08/04/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 08/05/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 08/05/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/08/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/13/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/13/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/14/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/14/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/27/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/28/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/19/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/20/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/26/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/02/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/04/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 11/09/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/15/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/27/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/27/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/27/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/02/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/08/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/08/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/08/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/14/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/14/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/15/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 02/15/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/15/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/15/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/01/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/01/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/01/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/08/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/08/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/14/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/17/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/12/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/10/2000