Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/11/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/11/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/11/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/11/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/11/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/11/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/11/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/11/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/11/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/11/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/11/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/11/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/09/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/09/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/09/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/09/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/09/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/09/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/09/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/09/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/09/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/28/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/28/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/28/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/28/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/13/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/10/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/10/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/16/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/01/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/15/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/18/2000