Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/16/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/16/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/16/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/16/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/18/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/25/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/20/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/21/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/22/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/29/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/29/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/04/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/04/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/04/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/04/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/06/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/06/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 05/12/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/12/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/12/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/13/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/13/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/19/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/19/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/19/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/08/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/08/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/10/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/15/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/17/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/17/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/17/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/22/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/30/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/30/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/30/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/13/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/20/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/20/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/22/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/27/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/09/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/02/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/01/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/01/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/10/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/10/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/04/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/04/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/09/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/09/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/16/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/16/2000