Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/17/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/17/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/27/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/27/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/27/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/27/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 04/27/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/27/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/27/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/27/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/27/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/27/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/27/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/01/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/01/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/01/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/01/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/01/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/15/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/15/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/15/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/15/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/15/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/26/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/06/2000