Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/17/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/17/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/25/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/25/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/12/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/13/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/03/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/03/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/06/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/16/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/24/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/25/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/13/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 08/05/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/21/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/04/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/20/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/11/2000