Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 03/17/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/17/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/17/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/24/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/13/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/15/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/06/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/11/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/14/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/14/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/30/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/13/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/23/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/23/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/01/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/02/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew