Refine your search

8 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
10/13/2000 Became Public Law No: 106-295.
10/13/2000 Signed by President.
10/06/2000 Presented to President.
10/04/2000 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9867)
09/28/2000 Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Smith, of NH without amendment. Without written report.
05/04/1999 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
04/27/1999 Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-112.
03/17/1999 Introduced in House