Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 03/18/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 03/18/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/18/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/18/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/28/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/28/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/28/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/28/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/28/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/24/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/24/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/24/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/24/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/24/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/24/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/24/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/24/1999
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/10/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/10/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/10/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/22/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/22/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/22/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/22/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/22/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/22/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/22/1999