Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/25/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/25/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/25/1999
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/25/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/25/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/28/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/06/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/11/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/11/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/11/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/18/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/25/1999
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/29/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/30/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/30/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/13/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/13/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/29/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 08/05/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/08/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/28/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/27/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/08/2000