Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/18/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/18/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/18/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/12/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/12/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/12/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/12/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/13/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/13/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/13/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/13/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/13/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/13/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/26/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/10/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/10/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/10/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/10/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/10/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/10/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/10/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/10/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/10/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/17/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/17/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/17/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/17/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/29/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/13/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/13/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/13/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/12/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/12/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/12/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/12/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/21/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/21/2000