Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/23/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/23/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 03/23/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/23/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 03/23/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 03/23/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/23/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/23/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/23/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/23/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/23/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/12/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/12/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/12/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/14/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/11/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/18/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 06/09/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/24/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/25/1999