Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/23/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/15/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 04/15/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/18/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/18/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/18/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/18/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/18/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/18/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/10/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/10/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/22/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/16/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/16/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/21/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/21/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/27/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/27/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/30/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/21/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/21/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/28/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/02/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/02/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/13/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/13/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/13/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/13/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/13/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/03/2000