Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/24/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/25/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/13/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/13/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/15/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/15/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/27/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/27/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/06/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/06/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/06/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/06/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 05/06/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/06/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/17/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/17/1999
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/17/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/17/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/17/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/17/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/17/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/20/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/20/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/26/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/26/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/26/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/22/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/13/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 07/29/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 07/29/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/08/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/08/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/22/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/22/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/20/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/20/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/20/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/20/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 11/05/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/10/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 11/10/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/17/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/15/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/15/2000