Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/24/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/24/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/06/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/06/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/06/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/06/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/15/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/29/1999