Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/27/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/27/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/28/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 04/28/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/28/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/03/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/03/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 05/03/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/03/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/04/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/05/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/05/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/06/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/06/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/06/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/11/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/11/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/11/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/13/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/13/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 05/13/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/18/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/18/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/18/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/18/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/18/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/19/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/19/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/19/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/24/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/24/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/24/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/26/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/26/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/08/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/09/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/15/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/15/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/15/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/16/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 06/16/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/22/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/22/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/29/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/15/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/15/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/27/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/15/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/15/1999