Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 03/24/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/25/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/25/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/12/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/12/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/12/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 05/20/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/20/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/24/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/24/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/24/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/25/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/25/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/25/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/25/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/25/1999