Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/29/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/29/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/29/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/29/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/29/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/29/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/29/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/29/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/29/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/29/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/29/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/29/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/29/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/29/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/29/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/29/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/29/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/29/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/05/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/05/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/05/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/11/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/11/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/11/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/19/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/19/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/19/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 05/20/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/26/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/26/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/26/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/18/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/24/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/29/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/29/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/21/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/08/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/14/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/21/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/03/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/01/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/08/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/22/2000