There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Mathematics and Science Proficiency Partnership Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To develop a demonstration project through the National Science Foundation to encourage interest in the fields of mathematics, science, and information technology.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/24/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
07/29/1999The Subcommittee on Basic Research held a hearing.
Action By: Committee on Science
04/20/1999Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2183-2184, H2187-2188)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/16/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
03/24/1999Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/1999Referred to House Science
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/1999Referred to the Committee on Science, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/1999Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (87)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/24/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/22/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/22/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/22/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/22/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/22/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/26/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 05/26/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/26/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/26/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/26/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/26/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/26/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/26/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/26/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/26/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/26/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/26/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/26/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/26/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/26/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/26/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/26/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/26/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/26/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/08/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/08/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/08/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/23/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/23/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/12/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/30/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/14/1999

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science03/24/1999 Referred to
07/29/1999 Hearings by
House Education and the Workforce03/24/1999 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families04/16/1999 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1265.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1265. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/24/1999)

Mathematics and Science Proficiency Partnership Act of 1999 - Requires the Director of the National Science Foundation (NSF), subject to appropriations, to carry out a demonstration project under which grants are awarded to five eligible local educational agencies (LEAs) in urban areas and five eligible LEAs in rural areas, for: (1) developing information technology programs that build or expand mathematics, science, and information technology curricula; (2) purchasing equipment necessary to establish such programs; and (3) providing teacher training in such fields.

Makes eligible for grants LEAs that: (1) are located in localities that have received an award from the NSF under the Urban Systemic Initiative or the Rural Systemic Initiative program; (2) provide assurances that they have executed conditional agreements with representatives of the private sector to provide services and scholarship funds; and (3) agree to enter into an agreement with the Director to comply with this Act.

Sets forth application requirements. Requires the Director to give special priority for grants to LEAs that demonstrate the greatest ability to obtain commitments from the private sector for services and funds.

Requires the Director to: (1) assess the effectiveness of activities under this Act; and (2) initiate a longitudinal study of students selected for scholarships and report findings to the Congress.

Authorizes appropriations. Limits the maximum grant awarded to an LEA.