Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/24/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/24/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/22/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/22/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/22/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/22/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/22/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/26/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 05/26/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/26/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/26/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/26/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/26/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/26/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/26/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/26/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/26/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/26/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/26/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/26/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/26/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/26/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/26/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/26/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/26/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/26/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/08/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/08/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/08/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/23/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/23/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/12/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/30/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/14/1999