Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/15/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/20/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/20/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/20/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/20/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/20/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/20/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/06/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/06/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/06/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/06/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/06/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/11/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/11/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/11/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/11/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/11/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/25/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/25/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/25/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/25/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/25/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/25/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/25/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/25/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/16/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/16/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/16/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/16/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/16/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/15/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/15/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/15/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/15/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/15/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/15/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/29/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/29/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/29/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/29/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/29/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/29/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/23/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/23/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/23/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/23/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/23/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/23/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/23/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/23/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/23/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/23/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/23/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/23/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/28/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/28/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/28/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/28/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/28/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/28/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/28/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/28/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/28/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/03/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/03/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/03/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 11/03/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/03/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/03/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/03/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/03/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/03/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/03/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/03/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/03/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/03/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 11/03/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 11/03/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/03/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/03/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/03/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/03/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/03/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 11/03/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 11/05/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/05/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/05/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/05/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/05/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/05/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/09/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/09/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/09/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/09/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/09/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 11/09/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/09/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/09/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/09/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/16/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/16/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/16/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/16/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/16/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/16/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/16/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 11/16/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 11/16/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/16/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/16/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/16/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/16/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/16/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/16/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/16/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 11/16/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 11/16/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/16/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/16/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/16/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 11/16/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/16/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 11/16/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/16/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 11/16/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 11/16/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 11/19/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/19/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/19/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/19/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/19/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/19/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/19/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/19/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/19/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/19/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 11/22/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/22/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/22/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/22/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/16/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/16/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/16/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/16/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/16/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/16/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/16/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/16/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/16/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/03/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/03/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/03/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/03/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/03/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/03/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/03/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/03/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/03/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/03/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/03/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/29/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/29/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/29/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/29/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/29/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/25/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/25/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/25/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/25/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/25/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/25/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/25/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/25/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/25/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/25/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/25/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 09/25/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/10/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/10/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/10/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/10/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/26/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/26/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/28/2000
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 10/28/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew