Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/25/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/25/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/15/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/05/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/15/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/18/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/22/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/13/1999