Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/25/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/13/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/13/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/13/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/13/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/13/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/13/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/04/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/04/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/04/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/04/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/14/1999
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 06/14/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/14/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/18/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/18/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/18/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/29/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/29/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/20/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/20/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/20/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/20/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 07/29/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/13/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/13/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/13/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/13/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/13/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/22/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 09/22/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/22/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 09/22/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/30/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/30/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/30/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/30/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/30/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/20/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 10/20/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/20/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/20/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/20/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/10/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/16/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 02/16/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/16/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/16/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/16/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/16/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 02/16/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew