Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 03/25/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/15/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/15/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/15/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/04/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/04/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/05/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/05/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/05/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/05/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/05/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/12/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/12/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/12/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/12/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 05/12/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/12/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/19/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/19/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/19/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/19/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/20/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/20/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/20/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/20/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/25/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/25/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/25/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/25/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/26/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/26/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/26/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/27/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/07/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/07/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/08/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/09/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/09/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/09/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/15/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/15/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/18/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/23/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/23/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/24/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/24/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/29/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/01/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/14/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/14/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/15/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 08/02/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 08/02/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/02/1999
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/05/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 08/05/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 08/05/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 08/05/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 08/05/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 08/05/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 08/05/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/05/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 08/05/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 08/05/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 08/05/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 08/05/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/21/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/21/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/21/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/21/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/22/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 09/22/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 09/22/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/24/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/24/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 09/24/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/24/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/24/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/24/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/30/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/30/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/12/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/12/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 10/20/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/20/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/20/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/27/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/27/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/18/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/18/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/03/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/20/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/14/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew